MA H4901 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 299 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 299 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Oxford be authorized to remove a certain residency requirement from the charter of said town. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Amending the charter of the town of Oxford to remove a certain residency requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-08 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 299 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2021-01-05 | House | Enacted |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-01-04 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-01-04 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-12-28 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-12-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-12-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2020-11-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-11-04 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4901 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4901.pdf |