MA H49 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4874
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
So much of the recommendations of the Commission on Uniform State Laws (House, No. 42) as relates to making uniform certain aspects of mediation. The Judiciary.
Title
Making uniform certain aspects of mediation
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4874 |
2017-04-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H43 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4419
H424 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4550
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H424 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4550
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H49 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H49.pdf |