MA H4892 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative MacGregor of Boston, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of William F. MacGregor that the commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance be authorized to release a certain sewer line easement in the West Roxbury section of the city of Boston. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Authorizing the division of capital asset management and maintenance to release a certain sewer line easement in the West Roxbury section of the city of Boston
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-31 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2024-07-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/24/2024 from 04:30 PM-03:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-07-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-07-19 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2024-02-12 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S2289 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S574 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S574 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4892 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4892.pdf |