MA H4887 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H4879
Note: Legislation replaced by S2842

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 28 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-30 - Committee of conference appointed (Lesser-Rodrigues-O'Connor), in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

House bill No. 4879, as changed by the

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enabling partnerships for growth

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-29 - Senate - Senate Engrossed Roll Call #260 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-30SenateCommittee of conference appointed (Lesser-Rodrigues-O'Connor), in concurrence
2020-07-30SenateSenate insisted on its amendments
2020-07-30SenateRules suspended
2020-07-30HouseCommittee of conference appointed (Michlewitz-Ferrante-Wong)
2020-07-30HouseHouse NON-concurred with the Senate amendment
2020-07-30HouseRules suspended
2020-07-30SenateCommittee of conference appointed (Lesser-Rodrigues-O'Connor), in concurrence
2020-07-30SenateSenate insisted on its amendments
2020-07-30SenateRules suspended
2020-07-29SenatePassed to be engrossed -see Roll Call No. 260 (Yeas 40 to Nays 0)
2020-07-29SenateRead third
2020-07-29SenateOrdered to a third reading
2020-07-29SenateFor Senate actions, see S2842
2020-07-29SenateAmended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2842, amended
2020-07-29SenateRead, rules suspended, read second
2020-07-28HousePassed to be engrossed - 156 YEAS to 3 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 241)
2020-07-28HouseH4879, published as amended

Same As/Similar To

H4879 (Replaces) 2020-08-04 - Amendment #266 (Sullivan) rejected
S2842 (Replaced by) 2020-07-29 - See H4887

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback