MA H4884 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5148

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5148
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to tort actions for latent diseases. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to tort actions for latent diseases

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-25HouseAccompanied a study order, see H5148
2020-10-27JointHearing scheduled for 10/30/2020 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
2020-10-01SenateSenate concurred
2020-08-06HouseReporting date extended to Thursday November 12, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-07-24SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-05HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary
2020-02-24HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

H5148 (Replaced by) 2020-11-25 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback