MA H4880 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4835
Note: Legislation replaced by H4884

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on October 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 279 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Section 90 contained in the engrossed Bill promoting climate change adaptation, environmental and natural resource protection, and investment in recreational assets and opportunity (see House, No. 4835), which had been returned by His Excellency the Governor with recommendation of amendment (for message, see Attachment B of House, No. 4884). August 13, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting the Mohawk Trail Woodland Partnership

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-31 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 279 of the Acts of 2018
2018-10-22SenateRe-enacted and again laid before the Governor
2018-10-22HouseRe-enacted
2018-10-22SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2018-10-22HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2018-10-18SenateGovernor's amendment adopted, in concurrence
2018-10-18SenateRules suspended
2018-10-09HouseGovernors amendment adopted (in the form approved by the committee on Bills in the Third Reading)
2018-10-09HouseBills in the Third Reading special report accepted
2018-08-13HouseReferred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading
2018-08-13HouseFor message, see H4884, Attachment B
2018-08-13HouseGovernor returned to the House with recommendation of amendment
2018-08-13HouseEnacted as section 90, see H4835

Same As/Similar To

H4835 (Replaced by) 2018-08-13 - Section returned with veto (see section 6) referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4884 (Replaced by) 2018-08-13 - See H4835
H4879 (Similar To) 2018-08-13 - Referred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading
H4881 (Similar To) 2018-08-13 - Referred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading
H4883 (Similar To) 2018-08-13 - Referred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading
H4882 (Similar To) 2018-08-13 - Referred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback