MA H486 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4968

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-07-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4968
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to providing for a paycheck protection program loan tax exemption. Covid-19 and Emergency Preparedness and Management.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to PPP loan tax exemption

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-07-20HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4968
2021-06-22JointHearing scheduled for 06/30/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Covid-19 and Emergency Preparedness and Management

Same As/Similar To

H4968 (Replaced by) 2022-07-20 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback