MA H4805 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4470
Note: Legislation replaced by H4822
Note: Legislation replaced by H4822
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 92-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-09 - Chapter 81 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 92-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-09 - Chapter 81 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to work and family mobility (House, No. 4547), reports recommending passage of the accompanying bill (House, No. 4805).
Title
Relative to work and family mobility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-09 - Senate - Senate Question on passing H4805, notwithstanding the objections of the Governor Roll Call #185 (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate conference committee report Roll Call #180 (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate conference committee report Roll Call #180 (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | Senate | Chapter 81 of the Acts of 2022 |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Passed over veto -see Roll Call #185 (Yeas 32 to Nays 8) |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-06-08 | House | Passed over veto - 119 YEAS to 36 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 195 ) |
2022-06-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-05-31 | House | Placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-05-31 | House | For message, see H4822 |
2022-05-27 | Governor returned to the House with veto | |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-05-26 | House | Enacted - 117 YEAS to 36 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 191 ) |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Committee of conference report accepted, in concurrence -see Roll Call #180 (Yeas 32 to Nays 8) |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-05-26 | House | Committee of conference report accepted - 118 YEAS to 36 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 189 ) |
2022-05-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-05-26 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance |
2022-05-19 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-05-19 | House | Reported on H4470 |
2022-05-19 | House | Reported from the committee of conference |
Same As/Similar To
H4470 (Replaced by) 2022-05-19 - Reported by H4805
H4461 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Published as amended, see H4470
S2289 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4459
H3456 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4459
H4459 (Similar To) 2022-02-15 - New draft substituted, see H4461
H4822 (Replaced by) 2022-05-31 - See H4805
H4461 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Published as amended, see H4470
S2289 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4459
H3456 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4459
H4459 (Similar To) 2022-02-15 - New draft substituted, see H4461
H4822 (Replaced by) 2022-05-31 - See H4805