MA H4804 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 3 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-12-06 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the town of Stoneham be authorized to grant certain licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the town of Stoneham to grant certain licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-06SenateRead, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
2018-12-03HouseRead third, amended and passed to be engrossed
2018-08-27HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-08-27HouseRules suspended
2018-08-27HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2018-08-13HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2018-08-03JointHearing scheduled for 08/07/2018 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1
2018-07-25SenateSenate concurred
2018-07-24HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

S2627 (Similar To) 2018-07-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H191 (Similar To) 2017-09-11 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
S117 (Similar To) 2017-09-08 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S418 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2459
H3536 (Similar To) 2017-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3756
H1994 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4995 (Similar To) 2018-12-13 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback