MA H4790 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4647
Note: Replaces legislation H4735
Note: Replaces legislation H4735
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on July 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to authorizing the committee on Revenue to make an investigation and study of certain House documents concerning revenue
Title
Late files
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-19 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-07-19 | House | Order reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
2018-07-19 | House | Accompanied by H4647 and H4735 |
2018-07-19 | House | Reported from the committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4647 (Replaces) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4790
H4735 (Replaces) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4790
S1716 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1573 (Similar To) 2017-05-10 - Accompanied S1604
H1634 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3667
H1348 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1621 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H4735 (Replaces) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4790
S1716 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1573 (Similar To) 2017-05-10 - Accompanied S1604
H1634 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3667
H1348 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1621 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4790 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4790.pdf |