MA H4782 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H4720

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 235 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the city of Quincy to grant veteran’s abatements of real estate taxes to certain veterans in the city of Quincy

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the city of Quincy to grant veteran’s abatements of real estate taxes to certain veterans in the city of Quincy

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-30 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 235 of the Acts of 2018
2018-08-23SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2018-08-23HouseEnacted
2018-08-20SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2018-08-20SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2018-07-25SenateRead, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
2018-07-24HouseRead third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
2018-07-23HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-07-23HouseRules suspended
2018-07-23HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2018-07-19HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2018-07-19HouseNew draft of H4720
2018-07-19HouseReported from the committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H4720 (Replaces) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4782
H409 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4579
S1932 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S1933 (Similar To) 2018-02-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1140 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback