MA H478 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4778
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish safeguards and public protections for consumers conducting bank transactions at automated teller machines. Financial Services.
Title
Establishing uniform safeguards and public protections for consumers conducting bank transactions at automated teller machines
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4778 |
2017-09-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/25/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H478 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H478.pdf |