MA H4774 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-21 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-21 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Xiarhos of Barnstable, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Steven G. Xiarhos (with the approval of the county commissioners) that Thomas Harmon be authorized to purchase creditable service from the Barnstable County Retirement Board. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing Thomas Harmon to purchase creditable service from the Barnstable County Retirement Board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-21 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2022-07-18 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-05 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-05 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-06-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-05-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/18/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-05 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2022-03-28 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S1751 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4774 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4774.pdf |