MA H4770 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H4753

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 464 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the town of Reading to grant additional licenses for the sale of alcoholic beverages

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the town of Reading to grant additional licenses for the sale of alcoholic beverages

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-13 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 464 of the Acts of 2016
2017-01-03SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2017-01-03HouseEnacted
2017-01-03SenateRead third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
2017-01-03SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2016-12-28SenateRead, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
2016-12-28HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2016-12-22HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2016-12-22HouseRules suspended
2016-12-22HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2016-12-22HouseCommittee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2016-12-22HouseNew draft of H4753
2016-12-22HouseReported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H4753 (Replaces) 2016-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4770
H3368 (Similar To) 2015-07-27 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3691
H3369 (Similar To) 2015-10-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2015
H3370 (Similar To) 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2015
H3371 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2016
H3372 (Similar To) 2016-02-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2016

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback