MA H4769 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4752
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on December 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-29 - Amended by substitution of a bil, H4786
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-29 - Amended by substitution of a bil, H4786
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the number of licenses for the sale of wines and malt beverages in the city of Medford from twenty five to forty
Title
Increasing the number of licenses for the sale of wines and malt beverages in the city of Medford from twenty five to forty
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-29 | House | Amended by substitution of a bil, H4786 |
2016-12-29 | House | Read third |
2016-12-22 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-12-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-12-22 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-12-22 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-12-22 | House | New draft of H4752 |
2016-12-22 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4752 (Replaces) 2016-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4769
H3368 (Similar To) 2015-07-27 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3691
H3369 (Similar To) 2015-10-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2015
H3370 (Similar To) 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2015
H3371 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2016
H3372 (Similar To) 2016-02-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2016
H3368 (Similar To) 2015-07-27 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3691
H3369 (Similar To) 2015-10-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2015
H3370 (Similar To) 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2015
H3371 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2016
H3372 (Similar To) 2016-02-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4769 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4769.pdf |