MA H4758 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on July 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Making appropriations for Fiscal Year 2018 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making appropriations for Fiscal Year 2018 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-16HouseReferred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

H3775 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 25 of the Acts of 2017
H3800 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Item 8910-0108 passed over veto - see Roll Call #298 [YEAS 32 to NAYS 6]
H3869 (Similar To) 2018-01-03 - No further action taken
H4242 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Text of an amendment, see H4160
H4382 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Accompanied H4514
H4514 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 90 of the Acts of 2018

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback