MA H4754 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5140
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H5140
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H5140
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to employment rights and protections for certain commissioned employees. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to commissioned employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-07 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5140 |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday October 27, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-06-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/12/2020 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Accepting Written Testimony |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-05-26 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2020-03-26 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H5140 (Replaced by) 2020-12-07 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4754 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4754.pdf |