MA H4746 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday October 27, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Labor and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to unemployment insurance for the gig economy, so-called. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

For unemployment rules for gig economy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-22HouseReporting date extended to Tuesday October 27, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-06-01JointHearing scheduled for 06/05/2020 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2020-05-21SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-23HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development
2020-04-16HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback