MA H4713 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on October 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Framingham be authorized to amend town meeting articles of said town. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Regarding town meeting articles in the town of Framingham
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-21 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-11-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-11-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-11-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-10-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-10-27 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H2845 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1652 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H505 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H506 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4601
H2692 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H4744 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 429 of the Acts of 2016
H4745 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 430 of the Acts of 2016
H1652 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H505 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H506 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4601
H2692 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H4744 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 429 of the Acts of 2016
H4745 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 430 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4713 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4713.pdf |