MA H4677 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H199
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on October 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-03 - See H199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-03 - See H199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Message from His Excellency the Governor returning with recommendation of amendment the engrossed Bill further regulating the recorking of wine (see House, No.199, changed and amended).
Title
Message from His Excellency the Governor returning with recommendation of amendment the engrossed Bill further regulating the recorking of wine (see House, No.199, changed and amended).
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-03 | House | See H199 |
Same As/Similar To
H199 (Replaced by) 2016-10-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 297 of the Acts of 2016
S1 (Similar To) 2015-01-08 - Placed on file
H49 (Similar To) 2015-02-11 - Reported, in part, by H52
H55 (Similar To) 2015-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2015
H59 (Similar To) 2016-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 165 of the Acts of 2015
H60 (Similar To) 2015-03-26 - Reported, in part, by H3203
H4756 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 393 of the Acts of 2016
H4755 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - See H2319
H3675 (Similar To) 2015-07-20 - See H3650
H61 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H3187 (Similar To) 2015-04-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2015
H3202 (Similar To) 2015-03-25 - Referred to the committee on House Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets
S1 (Similar To) 2015-01-08 - Placed on file
H49 (Similar To) 2015-02-11 - Reported, in part, by H52
H55 (Similar To) 2015-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2015
H59 (Similar To) 2016-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 165 of the Acts of 2015
H60 (Similar To) 2015-03-26 - Reported, in part, by H3203
H4756 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 393 of the Acts of 2016
H4755 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - See H2319
H3675 (Similar To) 2015-07-20 - See H3650
H61 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H3187 (Similar To) 2015-04-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2015
H3202 (Similar To) 2015-03-25 - Referred to the committee on House Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4677 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4677.pdf |