MA H467 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4274
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4274
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4274
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to protecting the legal harvest of striped bass. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Resolve protecting the legal harvest of striped bass
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] | Rep. Paul Heroux [D] | Rep. Bradford Hill [R] | Rep. Hannah Kane [R] |
Rep. Jay Livingstone [D] | Rep. Paul McMurtry [D] | Rep. John Rogers [D] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4274 |
2017-11-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/29/2017 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S492 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4274
H465 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4274
H466 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4274
H4274 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H465 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4274
H466 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4274
H4274 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H467 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H467.pdf |