MA H4633 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4695
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4695
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4695
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Saugus be authorized to continue the employment of Kevin Nichols, an employee of the Saugus Police Department, notwithstanding the maximum age requirement. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Saugus to employee Kevin Nichols, an employee of the Saugus Police Department, beyond the retirement age
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4695 |
2020-04-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/21/2020 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Electronic Hearing |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4695 (Replaced by) 2020-08-06 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4633 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4633.pdf |