MA H4633 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 178 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 178 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Sharon be authorized to use a certain parcel of land for general municipal purposes. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Sharon to use of a certain parcel of land for general municipal purposes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-31 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 483 (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 483 (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - Senate - Senate Enacted - Roll Call #548 [YEAS 36 to NAYS 0] (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 483 (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - Senate - Senate Enacted - Roll Call #548 [YEAS 36 to NAYS 0] (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 178 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-07-31 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2018-07-31 | Senate | Enacted - Roll Call #548 [YEAS 36 to NAYS 0] |
2018-07-31 | House | Enacted - 150 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 483) |
2018-07-30 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2018-07-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2018-07-30 | Senate | Read third, (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-30 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-12 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2018-07-12 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-03 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-06-27 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-06-19 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S1152 (Similar To) 2017-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2017
S1156 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342
S1154 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342
H1103 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H2284 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S1156 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342
S1154 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342
H1103 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H2284 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874