MA H4631 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5039

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-5)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5039
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to state employees performing core function during the Massachusetts state emergency related to COVID-19 emergency declaration. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to state employees performing core functions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-15HouseAccompanied a study order, see H5039
2020-06-04SenateSenate concurred
2020-05-04HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-04-16JointHearing scheduled for 04/21/2020 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Electronic Hearing
2020-04-09SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-06HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service
2020-04-02HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

H5039 (Replaced by) 2020-10-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback