MA H4618 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-03 - Amendment #1 (Jehlen) adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-03 - Amendment #1 (Jehlen) adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Similar Bills
Title
Similar Bills
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Balser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-03 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Jehlen) adopted |
2020-08-03 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Jehlen) adopted |
2020-07-07 | House | House adopted, in concurrence |
2020-07-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Adopted, in concurrence |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Amended |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-04-06 | House | Adopted |
2020-04-06 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-04-06 | House | Committee reported ought to be adopted |
2020-04-06 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4618 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4618.pdf |