MA H4598 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4634
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4634
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4634
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Cambridge be authorized to use certain recreational land for traffic reconfiguration purposes. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the City of Cambridge to use certain land used for open recreational purposes for traffic reconfiguration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4634 |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-06-11 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H1100 (Similar To) 2017-10-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 89 of the Acts of 2017
H3832 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
S2133 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - See H1100
H4143 (Similar To) 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 93 of the Acts of 2018
H4634 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4926 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3832 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
S2133 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - See H1100
H4143 (Similar To) 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 93 of the Acts of 2018
H4634 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4926 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4598 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4598.pdf |