MA H4596 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 441 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 441 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Deerfield be authorized to grant certain authority to the Deerfield Economic Development Industrial Corporation for commercial, business and housing development purposes . Economic Development and Emerging Technologies. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the Deerfield Economic Development Industrial Corporation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-13 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 441 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2017-01-03 | House | Enacted |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-11-10 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-09-29 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-09-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-09-29 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-09-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-09-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2016 from 01:00 PM-02:00 PM in B-1 |
2016-09-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-08-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4596 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4596.pdf |