MA H4589 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 126 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 126 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Hadley be authorized to convey a certain parcel of land dedicated for park purposes in said town. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Hadley to convey certain a certain parcel of land dedicated for park purposes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #243 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - House - House On Enactment land taking Yea and Nay No. 199 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - House - House On Enactment land taking Yea and Nay No. 199 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 126 of the Acts of 2020 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #243 (Yeas 39 to Nays 0) |
2020-07-22 | House | Enacted - 158 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 199) |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-06-22 | House | Read third, amended (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2020-05-07 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-05-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-05-07 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2020-04-21 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-04-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/16/2020 from 03:59 PM-04:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2020-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-26 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |