MA H4586 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H4616

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 26 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Reported on the residue by H4616
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to further addressing challenges faced by municipalities, school districts and state authorities resulting from COVID-19. March 24, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To further address challenges faced by municipalities, school districts and state authorities resulting from COVID-19

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-02HouseReported on the residue by H4616
2020-03-27HouseReported, in part, by H4598
2020-03-26HouseReferred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

H4616 (Replaces) 2020-04-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 56 of the Acts of 2020

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback