MA H4575 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-31 - Read, rules suspended read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-31 - Read, rules suspended read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Middlefield be authorized to appoint a superintendent of streets for said town. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the appointment of a superintendent of streets in the town of Middlefield
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-31 | Senate | Read, rules suspended read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-10-27 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2016-09-26 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-09-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-09-26 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-08-29 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-08-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-08-08 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4575 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4575.pdf |