MA H4573 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 162 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 162 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the terms of certain bonds to be issued by the Commonwealth
Title
Providing for the terms of certain bonds to be issued by the Commonwealth
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 162 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-07-25 | House | Enacted |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-07-25 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2018-07-23 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-07-12 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
2018-07-12 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-11 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-11 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-07-11 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-07-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-06-06 | House | Referred to the committee on House Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
Same As/Similar To
H1483 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1471 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H906 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S1360 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied S1380
H1719 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H4702 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Rejected
S2594 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4732 (Similar To) 2018-08-13 - Sections returned with veto (see section 20 and 62) referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4890 (Similar To) 2018-10-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 260 of the Acts of 2018
H4891 (Similar To) 2018-10-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 256 of the Acts of 2018
S1471 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H906 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S1360 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied S1380
H1719 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H4702 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Rejected
S2594 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4732 (Similar To) 2018-08-13 - Sections returned with veto (see section 20 and 62) referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4890 (Similar To) 2018-10-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 260 of the Acts of 2018
H4891 (Similar To) 2018-10-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 256 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4573 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4573.pdf |