MA H4571 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 494 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 494 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to direct wine shipper licenses Substituted by the House, on motion of Mr. Scibak of South Hadley, for a Bill regulating the granting of temporary licenses for the sale of wine, beer, and malt liquor at auctions (House, No. 270, changed). December 29, 2014.
Title
Relative to direct wine shipper licenses
Sponsors
Rep. John Scibak [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-08 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 494 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-01-06 | House | Again enacted |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2015-01-06 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2015-01-05 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2015-01-05 | Senate | Amendment (Wolf) adopted |
2015-01-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-01-05 | Senate | Motion to reconsider prevails |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Enacted |
2014-12-31 | House | Enacted |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-12-31 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-12-31 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment with a further amendment |
2014-12-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Read second, amended, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Read |
2014-12-29 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2014-12-29 | House | Substituted for H270 |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4571 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4571.pdf |