MA H4568 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5342
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5342
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5342
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish an elected and appointed board for the Hampden County Regional Retirement System. Public Service.
Title
Establishing an elected and appointed board for the Hampden County Regional Retirement System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-13 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5342 |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-18 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 10, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-04-19 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 20, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/05/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-03-17 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H5342 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4568 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4568.pdf |