MA H4560 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4661
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4661
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4661
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Andover be authorized to establish a means tested senior citizen property tax exemption in said town. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Andover to establish a means tested senior citizen property tax exemption
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4661 |
2018-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2018 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-06-04 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H1571 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H817 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H338 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H1538 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1524 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4001
H4661 (Replaced by) 2018-10-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 258 of the Acts of 2018
H4978 (Similar To) 2018-12-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4998
H4998 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H817 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H338 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H1538 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1524 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4001
H4661 (Replaced by) 2018-10-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 258 of the Acts of 2018
H4978 (Similar To) 2018-12-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4998
H4998 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4560 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4560.pdf |