MA H4555 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Reported, in part, by H868
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Reported, in part, by H868
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to hunting, sewers, hazardous waste sites and other related matters.
Title
Study Order
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Reported, in part, by H868 |
2024-04-16 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2024-04-16 | House | Order reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
2024-04-16 | House | Accompanied by H790, H799, H809, H810, H852, H854, H860, H868, H872, H877, H884, H912, H919, H920 and H921 |
2024-04-16 | House | Reported from the committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
H790 (Replaces) 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4555
H799 (Replaces) 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4555
H809 (Replaces) 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4555
H810 (Replaces) 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4555
H852 (Replaces) 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4555
H854 (Replaces) 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4555
H860 (Replaces) 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4555
H868 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H872 (Replaces) 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4555
H877 (Replaces) 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4555
H884 (Replaces) 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4555
H912 (Replaces) 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4555
H919 (Replaces) 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4555
H920 (Replaces) 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4555
H921 (Replaces) 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4555
H4111 (Similar To) 2023-10-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4522 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4668 (Similar To) 2024-05-23 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4738 (Similar To) 2024-06-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4778 (Similar To) 2024-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H799 (Replaces) 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4555
H809 (Replaces) 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4555
H810 (Replaces) 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4555
H852 (Replaces) 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4555
H854 (Replaces) 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4555
H860 (Replaces) 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4555
H868 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H872 (Replaces) 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4555
H877 (Replaces) 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4555
H884 (Replaces) 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4555
H912 (Replaces) 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4555
H919 (Replaces) 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4555
H920 (Replaces) 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4555
H921 (Replaces) 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4555
H4111 (Similar To) 2023-10-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4522 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4668 (Similar To) 2024-05-23 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4738 (Similar To) 2024-06-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4778 (Similar To) 2024-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4555 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4555.pdf |