MA H4553 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 503 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 503 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to local tax transparency Substituted by the House, on a motion of Mr. Dempsey of Haverhill, for a bill with the same title (House, No. 4519). December 15, 2014.
Title
Relative to local tax transparency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-08 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 503 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-01-06 | House | Enacted |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-01-06 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment with a further amendment |
2015-01-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Rodrigues) adopted |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Read third |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2429 |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Read second |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2429 |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2014-12-15 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2014-12-15 | House | Substituted for H4519 |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4553 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4553.pdf |