MA H4553 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 461 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 461 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase the membership of the commission on the status of grandparents raising grandchildren from 11 to 15 members and to allow for special appointments. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Grandparent Commission membership
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Donato [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-10 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 461 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Enacted |
2012-12-31 | House | Enacted |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2012-12-31 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2012-12-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-12-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-12-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders |
2012-12-27 | House | House CHouse oHouse mHouse mHouse iHouse tHouse tHouse eHouse eHouse House rHouse eHouse cHouse oHouse mHouse mHouse eHouse nHouse dHouse eHouse dHouse House oHouse uHouse gHouse hHouse tHouse House tHouse oHouse House pHouse aHouse sHouse sHouse House aHouse nHouse dHouse House rHouse eHouse fHouse eHouse rHouse rHouse eHouse dHouse House tHouse oHouse House tHouse hHouse eHouse |
2012-12-27 | House | House BHouse iHouse lHouse lHouse House rHouse eHouse pHouse oHouse rHouse tHouse eHouse dHouse House fHouse aHouse vHouse oHouse rHouse aHouse bHouse lHouse yHouse House bHouse yHouse House cHouse oHouse mHouse mHouse iHouse tHouse tHouse eHouse eHouse House aHouse nHouse dHouse House rHouse eHouse fHouse eHouse rHouse rHouse eHouse dHouse House tHouse oHouse House tHouse hHouse eHouse |
2012-12-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-12-10 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
2012-12-04 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4553 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=119927&generalCourtId=1 |