MA H4550 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4694
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4694
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4694
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creditable service for retirement purposes for certain persons employed in affiliation with the University of Massachusetts Medical School
Title
Relative to retirement benefits and UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-25 | Accompanied a study order, see H4694 | |
2010-03-08 | Senate concurred | |
2010-01-27 | Reported, referred to the committee on JOINT RULES, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Joint Committee on Public Service | |
2009-05-21 | Referred to the House Committee on HOUSE RULES |
Same As/Similar To
H4694 (Replaced by) 2010-09-02 - Reported, in part, by H01881
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/House/H4550 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=6686&generalCourtId=2 |