MA H4535 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 438 of the Acts 0f 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a building maintenance fund in the town of Northbridge. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a building maintenance fund in the town of Northbridge

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-09 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 438 of the Acts 0f 2012
2012-12-31SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2012-12-31HouseEnacted
2012-12-31SenateRead, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
2012-12-27HouseRead third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
2012-12-20HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2012-12-20HouseRules suspended
2012-12-20HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders
2012-12-20HouseHouse CHouse oHouse mHouse mHouse iHouse tHouse tHouse eHouse eHouse House rHouse eHouse cHouse oHouse mHouse mHouse eHouse nHouse dHouse eHouse dHouse House oHouse uHouse gHouse hHouse tHouse House tHouse oHouse House pHouse aHouse sHouse sHouse House aHouse nHouse dHouse House rHouse eHouse fHouse eHouse rHouse rHouse eHouse dHouse House tHouse oHouse House tHouse hHouse eHouse
2012-12-10SenateSenate concurred
2012-12-06HouseReferred to the House Committee on Municipalities and Regional

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback