MA H4534 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the purchase of prostate cancer medication. Public Health.
Title
To allow a sixty-day bulk purchase of prostate cancer medication
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-11-15 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
2012-11-13 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4534 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=119816&generalCourtId=1 |