MA H4530 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to distinctive plates, roadworks, bicycles and other related matters.
Title
Study Order
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2024-04-29 | House | Order reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
2024-04-29 | House | Accompanied by H3253, H3254, H3257, H3258, H3259, H3262, H3267, H3268, H3274, H3277, H3278, H3298, H3304, H3305, H3308, H3313, H3318, H3319, H3320, H3324, H3331, H3332, H3338, H3341, H3342, H3345, H3346, H3355, H3357, H3363, H3365, H3378, H3399, H3402, H3405, H3407, H3415, H3427, H3442, H3453, H3462, H3465, H3470, H3478 and H4018 |
2024-04-29 | House | Reported from the committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3253 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3254 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3257 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3258 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3259 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3262 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3267 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3268 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3274 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3277 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3278 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3298 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3304 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3305 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3308 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3313 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3318 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3319 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3320 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3324 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3331 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3332 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3338 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3341 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3342 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3345 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3346 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3355 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3357 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3363 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3365 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3378 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3399 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3402 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3405 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3407 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3415 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3427 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3442 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3453 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3462 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3465 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3470 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3478 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H4018 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H4577 (Similar To) 2024-05-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4716 (Similar To) 2024-06-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4899 (Similar To) 2024-07-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3254 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3257 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3258 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3259 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3262 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3267 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3268 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3274 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3277 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3278 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3298 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3304 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3305 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3308 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3313 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3318 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3319 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3320 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3324 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3331 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3332 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3338 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3341 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3342 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3345 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3346 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3355 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3357 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3363 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3365 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3378 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3399 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3402 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3405 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3407 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3415 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3427 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3442 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3453 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3462 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3465 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3470 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3478 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H4018 (Replaces) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H4577 (Similar To) 2024-05-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4716 (Similar To) 2024-06-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4899 (Similar To) 2024-07-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4530 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4530.pdf |