MA H453 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - Accompanied S446
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - Accompanied S446
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the promulgation of regulations by the Director of Fisheries and Wildlife within the Department of Fisheries, Wildlife and Environmental Law Enforcement for the use and possession of shotgun ammunition types for the purposes of hunting. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to the use of shotguns
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | Accompanied S446 |
2017-09-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/18/2017 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Division of Fisheries and Wildlife |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S432 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied S446
H1239 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
S1323 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S446 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H420 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2463
H1239 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
S1323 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S446 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H420 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2463
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H453 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H453.pdf |