MA H4526 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 389 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 389 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Northfield be authorized to appoint a treasurer for said town. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the treasurer of the town of Northfield
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Mark [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-11 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 389 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2017-01-03 | House | Enacted |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-12-28 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-12-27 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2016-09-01 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-09-01 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-09-01 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-08-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-07-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-07-19 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H227 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H907 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1010 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1011 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1482 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4748 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H907 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1010 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1011 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1482 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4748 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4526 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4526.pdf |