MA H4518 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 237 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 237 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substituted by the House, on motion of Mr. Donato of Medford, for a bill with the same title (House, No. 4101). July 14, 2016.
Title
Authorizing the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to grant certain easements in the city of Medford and in the town of Winchester
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Donato [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-10 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 237 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #668 [Yeas 38 to Nays 0] |
2016-07-31 | House | Enacted 158 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 538) |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-07-15 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-07-14 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-14 | House | Substituted for H4101 |
Same As/Similar To
H2976 (Similar To) 2016-01-11 - Accompanied H3095
H1833 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H983 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H650 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4653
H177 (Similar To) 2016-07-23 - Senate concurred
H4752 (Similar To) 2016-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4769
H1833 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H983 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H650 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4653
H177 (Similar To) 2016-07-23 - Senate concurred
H4752 (Similar To) 2016-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4769
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4518 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4518.pdf |