MA H4509 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-11-12 - Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2014 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-11-12 - Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2014 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative electronic automobile insurance charges. Financial Services.
Title
Relative electronic automobile insurance charges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2014 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2014-10-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-10-16 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on Financial Services |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4509 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4509.pdf |