MA H45 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4874

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

So much of the recommendations of the Commission on Uniform State Laws (House, No. 42) as relates to adopting the Uniform Assignment of Rents Act. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopting the Uniform Assignment of Rents Act

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-09HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4874
2017-09-19JointHearing scheduled for 09/26/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S1527 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H2454 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H788 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3561 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4279
H2247 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback