MA H4485 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 452 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 452 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the elected officials of the Cotuit Fire District. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the Cotuit Fire District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 452 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-12-31 | House | Enacted |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2012-12-28 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-12-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-12-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-12-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders |
2012-12-27 | House | House CHouse oHouse mHouse mHouse iHouse tHouse tHouse eHouse eHouse House rHouse eHouse cHouse oHouse mHouse mHouse eHouse nHouse dHouse eHouse dHouse House oHouse uHouse gHouse hHouse tHouse House tHouse oHouse House pHouse aHouse sHouse sHouse House aHouse nHouse dHouse House rHouse eHouse fHouse eHouse rHouse rHouse eHouse dHouse House tHouse oHouse House tHouse hHouse eHouse |
2012-12-10 | House | Reported favorably and referred to the House Committee on Health |
2012-11-30 | House | Recommitted to the committee on Public Service |
2012-11-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-11-30 | House | Committee recommended ought NOT to pass (under Joint |
2012-10-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-09-04 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2012-08-23 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4485 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=119538&generalCourtId=1 |