MA H4477 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4813
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-25 - New draft substituted, see H4813
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-25 - New draft substituted, see H4813
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Plymouth be authorized to grant easements relative to the Obery Street roadway improvement project in said town. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the grant of easements relative to the Obery Street Roadway Improvement Project to the Town of Plymouth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-25 | House | New draft substituted, see H4813 |
2018-07-25 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2018-07-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2018-07-25 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2018-07-25 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4813 |
2018-05-17 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Concurred |
2018-05-07 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S766 (Similar To) 2018-04-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3677 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1392 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Accompanied H3677
H2716 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1334 (Similar To) 2017-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 94 of the Acts of 2017
H4813 (Replaced by) 2018-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 158 of the Acts of 2018
H3677 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1392 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Accompanied H3677
H2716 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1334 (Similar To) 2017-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 94 of the Acts of 2017
H4813 (Replaced by) 2018-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 158 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4477 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4477.pdf |