MA H4469 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3521
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 236 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 236 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the conveyance of a certain parcel of land in the town of Chesterfield to Denise T. Cormier
Title
Authorizing the conveyance of a certain parcel of land in the town of Chesterfield to Denise T. Cormier
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-10 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 236 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #667 [Yeas 38 to Nays 0] |
2016-07-31 | House | Enacted 158 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 537) |
2016-07-31 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2016-07-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-28 | House | Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-21 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-07-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-07-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-07-21 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-07-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-07-07 | House | New draft of H3521 |
2016-07-07 | House | Reported from the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H3521 (Replaces) 2016-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4469
H3665 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - New draft substituted, see H3858
S1990 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - New draft substituted, see S2474
H3762 (Similar To) 2016-02-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2016
S2056 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - New draft substituted, see S2353
S2133 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - New draft substituted, see S2406
H3665 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - New draft substituted, see H3858
S1990 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - New draft substituted, see S2474
H3762 (Similar To) 2016-02-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2016
S2056 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - New draft substituted, see S2353
S2133 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - New draft substituted, see S2406
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4469 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4469.pdf |