MA H4464 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 195 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 195 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Salem be authorized to convey a certain parcel of land to North Shore Medical Center, Inc. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Salem to convey a certain parcel of park land.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Tucker [D] | Sen. Joan Lovely [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 195 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-07-30 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2016-07-30 | Senate | Enacted - Roll Call #530 [YEAS 39 - NAYS 0] |
2016-07-30 | House | Enacted 158 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 419) |
2016-07-30 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-30 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-07-28 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-07-28 | House | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-07-28 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-07-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-07-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-07-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-07-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2016 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in B-2 |
2016-07-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-07-05 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H4737 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4757
H1636 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4393
H1637 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1638 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4313
H2837 (Similar To) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 462 of the Acts of 2016
H1636 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4393
H1637 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1638 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4313
H2837 (Similar To) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 462 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4464 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4464.pdf |